U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gaines
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 10, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.