U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klainer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 24, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 17, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Suppress ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 09, 2022: [Indictment ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.