U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 06, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 23, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.