U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Culpepper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Seal ]
  • October 08, 2024: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 08, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Seal Document]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • January 26, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 26, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.