U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alwan, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Writ Issued ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Execution Issued ]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Application for Writ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Release Status Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 14, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 03, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • January 28, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.