U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Suppress]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • July 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.