U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:70-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Unseal Case]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
September, 2022
  • September 25, 2022: [JERS Exhibits - Public]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Writ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Detention]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.