U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Release Bond Obligation ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Release Bond Obligation ]
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Opinion from USCA]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Leave to File Document ]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 10, 2024: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • October 09, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 02, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 02, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 24, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 01, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.