U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arthur
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 03, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.