U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANCHEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 07, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 04, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.