U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLBERT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 18, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • May 19, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 11, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • May 11, 2022: [Leave to Appear]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 19, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 19, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.