U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • August 26, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • August 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 08, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 10, 2022: [Motion for Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 07, 2022: [Motion for Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 16, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • February 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 16, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.