U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PIERCE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 09, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • November 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 31, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.