U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRAND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 02, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Trial-Ongoing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Jury Trial-Ongoing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • September 12, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 05, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • September 02, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 30, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 25, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Telephonic Notice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Suppress]
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.