U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 20, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2023: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 06, 2023: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Objection]
  • December 16, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • December 12, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Supplement]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • September 24, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 24, 2022: [Jury Questions]
  • September 24, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • September 24, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Jury Trial-Ongoing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Jury Selection]
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 19, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 25, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • June 27, 2022: [Suppress]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 30, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 04, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.