U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARRA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 09, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appoint Expert ]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • February 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.