U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SWEENEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 27, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Status Report ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.