U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PETERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • September 08, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Status Report ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 25, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 27, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Oral Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.