U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHAFFER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • October 18, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • October 18, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Jury Trial-Finding of Not Guilty on All Counts]
  • October 17, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Brief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • October 05, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • September 26, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.