U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MACIAS-CARRILLO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [SEALED Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 20, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 09, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Mistrial]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 28, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Jury Trial-Finding of Guilty After Closing Arguments]
  • April 28, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • April 27, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 25, 2022: [Jury Trial Day 1-Voir Dire/Jury Selection]
  • April 25, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 22, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 22, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sever]
  • April 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • March 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 11, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.