U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strawn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Document]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.