U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez-Carmona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.