U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Term Status]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue Other]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • May 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • April 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 21, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.