U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lackey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 07, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • October 07, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 29, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver/Consent to Accelerated PSI Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • July 22, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Expedite]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • July 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 10, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 10, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Suppress]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 01, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 27, 2022: [Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 09, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 09, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 25, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • February 22, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 15, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.