U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 17, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 17, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2022: [Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue Other]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 09, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 07, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.