U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 20, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 03, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.