U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 15, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 15, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 03, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 22, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 18, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.