U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 08, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 10, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 23, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.