U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bobbitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.