U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mejia-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 09, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.