U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delchi-Ardon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.