U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 10, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 20, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 08, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 23, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 03, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.