U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Santos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • November 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 30, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 30, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 27, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • May 22, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 31, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 07, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 09, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.