U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00315-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franklin, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • August 02, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 26, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.