U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smokes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.