U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coghill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 09, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.