U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whiteside
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 21, 2022: [Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2022: [Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 05, 2022: [Suppress]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 07, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.