U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 08, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • July 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.