U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wheeler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 06, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • February 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.