U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHEFFIELD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • November 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 09, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 27, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • August 11, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • August 11, 2022: [Jury Questions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Jury Trial-Finding of Guilty]
  • August 10, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Jury Trial-Ongoing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Jury Trial Day 1-Voir Dire/Jury Selection]
  • August 08, 2022: [Jury Selection]
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 08, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 07, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Request]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 05, 2022: [Expert Witness Disclosed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 04, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • July 29, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 26, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • July 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • July 08, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • June 26, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • May 06, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 08, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.