U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.