U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 16, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 09, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 25, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.