U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTINEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 12, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice-Other]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arrest]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.