U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALLEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 18, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 18, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.