U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOWMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 28, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 06, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 15, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.