U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WIMBUSH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motions Referred]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • October 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sever]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.