U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • December 21, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 06, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 06, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 30, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.