U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ-OTERO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 23, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 21, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.