U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARCHER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • June 02, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 09, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 09, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.