U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • August 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.